This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/14/2023 at 09:17:30 (UTC).

Butte Credit vs. Sands, Eric

Case Summary

On 04/06/2023 Butte Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sands, Eric. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0852

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte Credit

Defendants

Sands, Eric

Esparza, Nicole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

04/06/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

04/06/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

04/06/2023: Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

Complaint

04/06/2023: Complaint

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

04/07/2023: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

05/09/2023: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration; Comment: Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less