This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/21/2022 at 11:25:08 (UTC).

Capital One Bank (USA), N A vs Sanzone, Andrea L

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 Capital One Bank USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sanzone, Andrea L. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glusman, Robert A, Benson, Stephen E and Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0363

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glusman, Robert A

Benson, Stephen E

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capital One Bank (USA), N A

Defendant

Sanzone, Andrea L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bleier, Elizabeth Ann

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/01/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

02/01/2018: Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed

02/01/2018: Summons Issued / Filed

Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non-Military Status

02/01/2018: Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non-Military Status

Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

05/01/2020: Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Mailing of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

05/01/2020: Proof of Mailing of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Change of Firm Name and Notice of Change of Firm Address

05/15/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name and Notice of Change of Firm Address

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

05/15/2020: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/01/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

02/01/2018: Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed

02/01/2018: Summons Issued / Filed

Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non-Military Status

02/01/2018: Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non-Military Status

Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

05/01/2020: Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

Proof of Mailing of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

05/01/2020: Proof of Mailing of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Change of Firm Name and Notice of Change of Firm Address

05/15/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name and Notice of Change of Firm Address

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

05/15/2020: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Order to Show Case Issued for Failure to Provide Service as to Andrea L Sanzone

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketChange of Address; Notice of Change of Firm Name and Notice of Change of Firm Address; Comment: Notice of Change of Firm Name and Notice of Change of Firm Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Proof of Mailing of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service; Comment: Proof of Mailing of Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re Contempt - Court Issued; Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service; Judicial Officer: Glusman, Robert A; Comment: Order to Show Cause Re Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: First Cause of Action- Breach of Cardholder Agreement; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $3361.47; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 02/01/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non-Military Status; Comment: of Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Non-Military Status

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bleier, Elizabeth A