This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/16/2021 at 06:03:27 (UTC).

Cambridge Res Co. vs Divine, Kaitlynn E

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Cambridge Res Co filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Divine, Kaitlynn E. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1276

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cambridge Res Co.

Defendant

Divine, Kaitlynn E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mayberry, Ryan Austin

Rothbard, Todd Bennett

Naumchik, Steven Tafoya

Skarbek, Brian R

Dabis, Christina Norma

 

Court Documents

Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

05/18/2021: Unlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

05/18/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

05/18/2021: Unlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

Notice Re. Unlawful Detainer Action

05/18/2021: Notice Re. Unlawful Detainer Action

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Kaitlynn E Divine

06/09/2021: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Kaitlynn E Divine

Request to Enter Default-Entered

06/09/2021: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does 1-100

06/09/2021: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does 1-100

Default Judgment By Clerk - Possession Only

06/18/2021: Default Judgment By Clerk - Possession Only

Writ of Possession

06/18/2021: Writ of Possession

Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

07/08/2021: Writ of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Peaceful Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer; Gingery, Virginia; Judgment Type; Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names: Cambridge Res Co.; Divine, Kaitlynn E; Unlawful Detainer; Awarded To: Cambridge Res Co.; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 675 Mitchell Avenue Apartment #K-1 aka #1 Oroville CA 95965; Awarded Against: Divine, Kaitlynn E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Possession

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk - Possession Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does 1-100; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Does 1-100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Kaitlynn E Divine; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Kaitlynn E Divine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 05/21/2021; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice re Unlawful Detainer Action (CCP1161.2); Notice Re. Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Supplemental Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketMemo To Set, Dismissal or Settlement Due - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAUMCHIK, STEVE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DABIS ESQ, CHRISTINA N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SKARBEK, BRIAN R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYBERRY, RYAN