This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/08/2022 at 19:36:23 (UTC).

BUTTE WATER DISTRICT VS NORRIS, TONY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2003 BUTTE WATER DISTRICT filed an Other lawsuit against NORRIS, TONY. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott, William O. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1420

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Scott, William O

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUTTE WATER DISTRICT

Defendants

NORRIS, TONY

ENRIQUEZ, DAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Knowles, Sara M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2014
  • DocketCase File Destroyed; Comment: CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: WJA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2003
  • DocketJudgment; Comment: JUDGMENT (CIVIL) ENTERED HON. WILLIAM O. SCOTT; COMMISSIONER (G11) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2003
  • DocketStipulation; Comment: STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO SIT AS JUDGE PRO TEM Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2003
  • DocketCourt Trial; Judicial Officer: Scott, William O; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Desc: COURT TRIAL - MUNI COURT/CIVIL Desc2: U.D. Notice Date: 2003-10-28 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 243 - JMT FOR PLTF Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2003
  • DocketNotice; Comment: NTC: COURT TRIAL - MUNI COURT/CIVIL U.D. Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2003
  • DocketMemorandum; Comment: MEMO TO SET FILED BY: PLTF (X) COURT ( ) JURY - ... DAY(S) 1 HR(S) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2003
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: POS OF SUMMONS, COMPL, & PREJMT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSS... ON DAWN ENRIQUEZ 9/25/03-PER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2003
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: POS OF SUMMONS, COMPL, PREJMT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSS... ON TONY NORRIS 9/25/03-PER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2003
  • DocketAnswer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000; Comment: ANSWER FILED D. ENRIQUEZ & A. NORRIS W1 (UNDER 10K) Fee Type: W1 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 2 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 264.00 Entry Clerk: MMH 11 - $4.00 279 - $94.00 37 - $52.00 36 - $16.00 46 - $6.00 280 - $16.00 284 - $36.00 324 - $40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2003
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver; Comment: ORDER RE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS GRANTED TO DEFT: ANTHONY NORRIS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2003
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Comment: APP FOR ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DEFT: ANTHONY NORRIS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2003
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver; Comment: ORDER RE: WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS GRANTED TO DEFT: DAWN ENRIQUEZ Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2003
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Comment: APP FOR ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DEFT: DAWN ENRIQUEZ Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2003
  • DocketPersonal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2003
  • DocketPersonal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2003
  • DocketNew Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2003
  • DocketLegacy Service Information; Comment: Name: ENRIQUEZ, DAWN PartyId: GC01420_2_200_3 Service Type: PER Summons Date: 2003-09-25 00:00:00.0000000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2003
  • DocketLegacy Service Information; Comment: Name: NORRIS, TONY PartyId: GC01420_2_200_2 Service Type: PER Summons Date: 2003-09-25 00:00:00.0000000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2003
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer (5 Day Summons Issued); Comment: COMPLAINT FILED-UNLAWFUL DETAINER - VERIFIED 5 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED W3 Fee Type: W3 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 135.30 Entry Clerk: MMH 11 - $2.00 278 - $55.00 37 - $26.00 36 - $3.00 46 - $3.00 280 - $8.30 284 - $18.00 324 - $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2003
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Comment: COVER SHEET [CIVIL] Case Category Code: 32 Remedies: (M, N, P) # c/a: Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Butte Water District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Knowles, Sara M