This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/09/2022 at 02:12:18 (UTC).

Butte Water District vs Khan, Mohammed Rizwan

Case Summary

On 06/30/2017 Butte Water District filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Khan, Mohammed Rizwan. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Goldkind, Leonard D and Gunn, David E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1838

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Goldkind, Leonard D

Gunn, David E

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Butte Water District

Respondent

Khan, Mohammed Rizwan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

McClure, Andrew John

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

07/12/2017: Proof of Service

Proof of Service

07/12/2017: Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketReview Hearing; Judicial Officer: Gunn, David E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: on Parties Stipulated Agreement; Petitioner: Butte Water District; Attorney: McClure, Andrew John; Respondent: Khan, Mohammed Rizwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DocketReport; Comment: Status Update for Review Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: By Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order - Harassment; Judicial Officer: Gunn, David E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Temps Continued; Petitioner; Attorney: McClure, Andrew John; Respondent: Khan, Mohammed Rizwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order - Harassment; Judicial Officer: Gunn, David E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Petitioner; Attorney: McClure, Andrew John; Respondent: Khan, Mohammed Rizwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Comment: Order Granting Fee Waiver & FW 010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Granted; Judicial Officer: Gunn, David E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketResponse to Petn for Workplace Violence Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order - Harassment; Judicial Officer: Gunn, David E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: filed 06/30/2017 Temporary Orders Granted; Petitioner; Attorney: McClure, Andrew John; Respondent: Khan, Mohammed Rizwan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: WV-109, WV-110, WV-100, WV-120, WV-120-info, WV-800,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Civil Harassment; Judicial Officer: Gunn, David E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Gunn, David E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Workplace Violence Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Butte Water District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew John McClure