This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/18/2023 at 11:38:35 (UTC).

Butte Credit vs. Kendrick, Michael J C

Case Summary

On 03/13/2023 Butte Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kendrick, Michael J C. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0613

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte Credit

Defendant

Kendrick, Michael J C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

03/13/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

03/13/2023: Complaint

Assignee/ Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

03/13/2023: Assignee/ Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

03/14/2023: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Service of Summons

05/02/2023: Proof of Service of Summons

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

05/09/2023: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Civil Minutes

07/05/2023: Civil Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: Further Status

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $5063.53; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $181.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 03/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 04/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Assignee/ Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration; Comment: Assignee/ Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less