This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/12/2023 at 21:09:31 (UTC).

Butte Credit vs. Hamilton, Ryan Patrick

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 Butte Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hamilton, Ryan Patrick. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0597

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte Credit

Defendant

Hamilton, Ryan Patrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/09/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

03/09/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

03/09/2023: Complaint

Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

03/09/2023: Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

03/13/2023: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

05/04/2023: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $5655.32; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $181.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 03/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration; Comment: Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less