This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/12/2023 at 21:09:31 (UTC).

Butte Credit vs. Hamilton, Ryan Patrick

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 Butte Credit filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hamilton, Ryan Patrick. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0597

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte Credit

Defendant

Hamilton, Ryan Patrick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/09/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

03/09/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint

03/09/2023: Complaint

Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

03/09/2023: Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

03/13/2023: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

05/04/2023: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

 

Docket Entries

06/28/2023

DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $5655.32; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $181.0

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 03/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketProof of Service; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration; Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration; Comment: Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued and Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less