This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/21/2022 at 04:02:54 (UTC).

Butte Credit County Bureau vs Larson-Bethel, Dresden Alan

Case Summary

On 02/26/2020 Butte Credit County Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Larson-Bethel, Dresden Alan. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0580

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte County Credit Bureau

Defendant

Larson-Bethel, Dresden Alan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

02/26/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

02/26/2020: Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

Complaint

02/26/2020: Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to Dresden Alan Larson-Bethel

03/18/2020: Proof of Service of Summons as to Dresden Alan Larson-Bethel

Request to Enter Default-Entered

07/29/2020: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Default Judgment by Clerk

07/29/2020: Default Judgment by Clerk

Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest

07/29/2020: Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest

Civil Case Cover Sheet

02/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

02/26/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

02/26/2020: Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

Complaint

02/26/2020: Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons as to Dresden Alan Larson-Bethel

03/18/2020: Proof of Service of Summons as to Dresden Alan Larson-Bethel

Request to Enter Default-Entered

07/29/2020: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Default Judgment by Clerk

07/29/2020: Default Judgment by Clerk

Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest

07/29/2020: Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; Butte County Credit Bureau; Larson-Bethel, Dresden Alan; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Butte County Credit Bureau; Awarded Against; Larson-Bethel, Dresden Alan; Judgment Amount: $4,131.31; Amount; Damages: $2,532.23; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $716.62; Attorney Fees: $633.06; Costs: $249.40; Total: $4131.31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest; Comment: Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk; Default Judgment by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Dresden Alan Larson-Bethel; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Dresden Alan Larson-Bethel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Accounts Stated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Open Book Account; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $181.0; Remedy: Attorney's Fees; Amount: $633.06; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $2532.23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 02/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 02/26/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 03/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration; Comment: Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less