This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 02:10:40 (UTC).

BUTTE COUNTY CREDITY BUREAU vs Hilstad, Jeffrey Lee

Case Summary

On 03/27/2017 BUTTE COUNTY CREDITY BUREAU filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Hilstad, Jeffrey Lee. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0801

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUTTE COUNTY CREDITY BUREAU

Defendant

Hilstad, Jeffrey Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph L

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/27/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service of Summons Filed

05/01/2017: Proof of Service of Summons Filed

Summons Issued / Filed

03/27/2017: Summons Issued / Filed

Declaration

03/27/2017: Declaration

Complaint

03/27/2017: Complaint

Declaration re Interest

07/12/2017: Declaration re Interest

Default Judgment By Clerk

07/12/2017: Default Judgment By Clerk

Writ of Execution Issued

10/03/2017: Writ of Execution Issued

Request to Enter Default-Entered to J Hilstad

07/12/2017: Request to Enter Default-Entered to J Hilstad

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

01/03/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

Writ of Execution Issued

10/03/2017: Writ of Execution Issued

Default Judgment By Clerk

07/12/2017: Default Judgment By Clerk

Declaration re Interest

07/12/2017: Declaration re Interest

Request to Enter Default-Entered to J Hilstad

07/12/2017: Request to Enter Default-Entered to J Hilstad

Proof of Service of Summons Filed

05/01/2017: Proof of Service of Summons Filed

Summons Issued / Filed

03/27/2017: Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint

03/27/2017: Complaint

Declaration

03/27/2017: Declaration

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued; Comment: to Glenn County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; BUTTE COUNTY CREDITY BUREAU; Hilstad, Jeffrey Lee; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; BUTTE COUNTY CREDITY BUREAU; Awarded Against; Hilstad, Jeffrey Lee; Judgment Amount: $4,279.71; Amount; Damages: $3,065.00; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $217.46; Attorney Fees: $766.25; Costs: $231.00; Total: $4279.71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration re Interest; Comment: re Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered; Request to Enter Default-Entered to J Hilstad; Comment: Jeffrey Lee Hilstad

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Second Cause - Accounts Stated; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $3065.0; Remedy: Attorney's Fees; Amount: $766.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: First Cause - Open Book Account; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $3065.0; Remedy: Attorney's Fees; Amount: $766.25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 03/27/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 03/27/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 04/18/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: Assignee / Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Butte County Credit Bureau, A Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Selby, Joseph Luther