This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 11:14:16 (UTC).

Butte County Credit Bureau vs Watts, Gregory M

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Butte County Credit Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Watts, Gregory M. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1300

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte County Credit Bureau

Defendant

Watts, Gregory M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

05/20/2021: Summons

Complaint

05/20/2021: Complaint

Declaration of Non-Service

11/10/2021: Declaration of Non-Service

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

12/06/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/13/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

05/20/2021: Summons

Complaint

05/20/2021: Complaint

Declaration of Non-Service

11/10/2021: Declaration of Non-Service

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

12/06/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/13/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal; Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Non-Service; Comment: Declaration of Non-Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Account Stated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Indebted for Money due Principal Claimed; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $21193.7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less