This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 11:15:44 (UTC).

Butte County Credit Bureau vs Rodriguez, Sadie D

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Butte County Credit Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rodriguez, Sadie D. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1299

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte County Credit Bureau

Defendant

Rodriguez, Sadie D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

01/07/2022: Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

Declaration re Attorneys Fees

09/29/2021: Declaration re Attorneys Fees

Declaration re Interest

09/29/2021: Declaration re Interest

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

07/20/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Complaint

05/20/2021: Complaint

Writ of Execution Issued

10/04/2021: Writ of Execution Issued

Default Judgment by Clerk

09/29/2021: Default Judgment by Clerk

Request to Enter Default-Entered

09/29/2021: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Summons

05/20/2021: Summons

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; Butte County Credit Bureau; Rodriguez, Sadie D; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Butte County Credit Bureau; Awarded Against; Rodriguez, Sadie D; Amount; Damages: $6,957.22; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,217.01; Attorney Fees: $1,561.90; Costs: $301.40; Total: $11037.53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration re Attorneys Fees; Comment: Declaration re Attorneys Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration re Interest; Comment: Declaration re Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk; Default Judgment by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Account Stated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Indebted for Money due Principal Claimed; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $6957.22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 07/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less