This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/21/2022 at 23:08:57 (UTC).

Butte County Credit Bureau vs Reusser, Anita M et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Butte County Credit Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Reusser, Anita M. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1298

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte County Credit Bureau

Defendants

Reusser, Vincent S

Reusser, Anita M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Issued

04/13/2022: Abstract of Judgment - Issued

Writ of Execution Issued

01/14/2022: Writ of Execution Issued

Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Enloe Physician

01/06/2022: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Enloe Physician

Request for Clerks Judgment

01/06/2022: Request for Clerks Judgment

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Anita M Reusser

09/16/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Anita M Reusser

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Vincent S Reusser

09/16/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Vincent S Reusser

Summons

05/20/2021: Summons

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

05/06/2022: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

04/29/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; Butte County Credit Bureau; Reusser, Anita M; Reusser, Vincent S; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Butte County Credit Bureau; Awarded Against; Reusser, Anita M; Reusser, Vincent S; Amount; Damages: $5,844.48; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $3,032.11; Attorney Fees: $1,591.92; Costs: $356.40; Total: $10824.91

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation; Comment: Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of M Anderson re Interest; Comment: Declaration of M Anderson re Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entered in Part; Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Enloe Physician; Comment: Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part as to Enloe Physician

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk; Request for Clerks Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Anita M Reusser; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Anita M Reusser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Vincent S Reusser; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint as to Vincent S Reusser

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Account Stated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Indebted for Money Due Principal Claim; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $5880.97

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 08/29/2021; Served: 08/30/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less