This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 19:00:40 (UTC).

Butte County Credit Bureau vs Osborn, Jeffrey A

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Butte County Credit Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Osborn, Jeffrey A. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1239

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte County Credit Bureau

Defendants

Osborn, Steffanie J

Osborn, Jeffrey A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

09/02/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

Writ of Execution Returned - Satisfied

08/18/2022: Writ of Execution Returned - Satisfied

Writ of Execution Issued

03/02/2022: Writ of Execution Issued

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jeffrey A Osborn

01/18/2022: Proof of Service of Summons as to Jeffrey A Osborn

Proof of Service of Summons as to Steffanie J Osborn

01/18/2022: Proof of Service of Summons as to Steffanie J Osborn

Proof of Mailing

01/03/2022: Proof of Mailing

Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service

12/29/2021: Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service

Complaint

05/13/2021: Complaint

Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

05/13/2021: Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; Butte County Credit Bureau; Osborn, Jeffrey A; Osborn, Steffanie J; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Butte County Credit Bureau; Awarded Against; Osborn, Jeffrey A; Osborn, Steffanie J; Amount; Damages: $1,695.89; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $510.93; Attorney Fees: $423.97; Costs: $312.40; Total: $2943.19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: Declaration of M Anderson re Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Jeffrey A Osborn; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Jeffrey A Osborn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons as to Steffanie J Osborn; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Steffanie J Osborn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Court Issued; Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Comment: Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Account Stated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: OPen Book Account; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $1695.89

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 01/11/2022; Served: 01/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction; Comment: Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less