This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/18/2023 at 19:00:45 (UTC).

Butte County Credit Bureau vs Mai, Michael Van

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Butte County Credit Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mai, Michael Van. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1240

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte County Credit Bureau

Defendant

Mai, Michael Van

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

06/18/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

09/02/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

Writ of Execution Returned - Satisfied

08/18/2022: Writ of Execution Returned - Satisfied

Writ of Execution Issued

09/24/2021: Writ of Execution Issued

Declaration re Judgment

09/23/2021: Declaration re Judgment

Default Judgment by Clerk

09/23/2021: Default Judgment by Clerk

Request to Enter Default-Entered

09/23/2021: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Complaint

05/13/2021: Complaint

Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

05/13/2021: Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; Butte County Credit Bureau; Mai, Michael Van; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Butte County Credit Bureau; Awarded Against; Mai, Michael Van; Amount; Damages: $1,268.46; Pre-Judgment Interest: $316.95; Attorney Fees: $317.12; Costs: $433.40; Total: $2335.93

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration re Judgment; Comment: Declaration re Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk; Default Judgment by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Account Stated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Open Book Account; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $1268.46

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 06/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction; Comment: Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less