This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/18/2022 at 07:04:52 (UTC).

BUTTE COUNTY CREDIT BUREAU vs LITTLE, FRANCISCO M

Case Summary

On 01/13/2016 BUTTE COUNTY CREDIT BUREAU filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LITTLE, FRANCISCO M. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **5604

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUTTE COUNTY CREDIT BUREAU

Defendant

LITTLE, FRANCISCO M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SELBY, JOSEPH L

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons as to Francisco M Little

08/10/2016: Proof of Service of Summons as to Francisco M Little

Summons Issued and Filed

01/13/2016: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint Filed - 30 Day Summons Issued - Under 10K

01/13/2016: Complaint Filed - 30 Day Summons Issued - Under 10K

Civil Case Cover Sheet

01/13/2016: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration

03/25/2016: Declaration

Declaration

08/10/2016: Declaration

Declaration

08/10/2016: Declaration

Ex Parte Application W/O Hearing

03/25/2016: Ex Parte Application W/O Hearing

Declaration

08/10/2016: Declaration

Amended - No Fee

08/23/2016: Amended - No Fee

Default Judgment By Court

08/12/2016: Default Judgment By Court

Declaration of Elizabeth Ekman in Support of Default Judgment

08/10/2016: Declaration of Elizabeth Ekman in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Dawn Wright in Support of Default Judgment

08/10/2016: Declaration of Dawn Wright in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation

08/10/2016: Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation

Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest

08/10/2016: Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest

Request to Enter Default-Entered

08/10/2016: Request to Enter Default-Entered

Declaration of Publication

08/10/2016: Declaration of Publication

Order for Publication or Posting

04/12/2016: Order for Publication or Posting

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; BUTTE COUNTY CREDIT BUREAU; LITTLE, FRANCISCO M; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; BUTTE COUNTY CREDIT BUREAU; Awarded Against; LITTLE, FRANCISCO M; Judgment Amount: $12,518.59; Amount; Damages: $8,649.41; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,504.41; Attorney Fees: $1,732.59; Costs: $632.18; Total: $12518.59

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended - No Fee; Comment: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; BUTTE COUNTY CREDIT BUREAU; LITTLE, FRANCISCO M; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; BUTTE COUNTY CREDIT BUREAU; Awarded Against; LITTLE, FRANCISCO M; Judgment Amount: $12,518.59; Amount; Damages: $8,649.41; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,504.41; Attorney Fees: $1,732.59; Costs: $632.18; Total: $12518.59

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 04/28/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Court; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Elizabeth Ekman in Support of Default Judgment; Comment: Declaration of Elizabeth Ekman in Support of Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Dawn Wright in Support of Default Judgment; Comment: Declaration of Dawn Wright in Support of Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation; Comment: Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest; Comment: Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered; Comment: Francisco M Little

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of Publication; Comment: Declaration of Publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service; Proof of Service of Summons as to Francisco M Little; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons as to Francisco M Little

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder for Publication or Posting; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Comment: Order for Publication of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration for Support of Application for Order for Publication of Summons; Comment: Declaration for Support of Application for Order for Publication of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Application without Hearing; Ex Parte Application for Order for Publication of Summons (CCP 415.50), Declaration and Points and A; Comment: Ex Parte Application for Order for Publication of Summons (CCP 415.50), Declaration and Points and Authorities

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: Declaration of Diligence to Effect Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Filed - 30 Day Summons Issued - Under 10K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Butte County Credit Bureau, A Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Selby, Joseph Luther