This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 11:13:56 (UTC).

Butte County Credit Bureau vs Gorman, Charissa A

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Butte County Credit Bureau filed an Other lawsuit against Gorman, Charissa A. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1297

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte County Credit Bureau

Defendant

Gorman, Charissa A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

12/23/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Civil Minutes

11/10/2021: Civil Minutes

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

10/26/2021: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

05/20/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Summons

05/20/2021: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

12/30/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Proof of Mailing

11/10/2021: Proof of Mailing

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Charissa A Gorman

08/12/2021: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Charissa A Gorman

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Further Status

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal; Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Civil Case Cover Sheet; Summons; Complaint; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Proof of Mailing; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Charissa A Gorman; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement; Civil Minutes; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Plaintiff; Attorney: Selby, Joseph Luther

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Charissa A Gorman; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Charissa A Gorman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Account Stated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Indebted for Money Due Principal Claimed; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $33061.27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 08/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less