This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 11:13:38 (UTC).

Butte County Credit Bureau vs Gebhart, Enid Adah

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Butte County Credit Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Gebhart, Enid Adah. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mosbarger, Tamara L and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1295

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte County Credit Bureau

Defendant

Gebhart, Enid Adah

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Summons

05/20/2021: Summons

Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

10/07/2021: Plaintiff's Case Management Statement

Proof of Mailing

01/05/2022: Proof of Mailing

Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation

01/04/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation

Default Judgment by Court

01/04/2022: Default Judgment by Court

Civil Minutes

11/10/2021: Civil Minutes

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

10/27/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

05/20/2021: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Complaint

05/20/2021: Complaint

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Continued from 11/10/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued; Writ of Execution Issued - Tehama; Comment: Tehama

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court; Party; Names; Butte County Credit Bureau; Gebhart, Enid Adah; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Butte County Credit Bureau; Awarded Against; Gebhart, Enid Adah; Amount; Damages: $30,440.51; Pre-Judgment Interest: $7,239.01; Attorney Fees: $3,640.19; Costs: $555.10; Total: $41874.81

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration in Support of Default Judgment; Comment: Declaration in Support of Default Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest; Comment: Declaration of M Anderson Re Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation; Comment: Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Court; Default Judgment by Court; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Account Stated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Indebted for Money Due Principal Claimed; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $30440.51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 10/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less