This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/02/2022 at 10:32:21 (UTC).

Butte County Credit Bureau vs Culver, Janae Kay

Case Summary

On 05/13/2021 Butte County Credit Bureau filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Culver, Janae Kay. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1237

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte County Credit Bureau

Defendant

Culver, Janae Kay

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

05/13/2021: Summons

Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

05/13/2021: Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

Complaint

05/13/2021: Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

09/13/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

10/12/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/13/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

05/13/2021: Summons

Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

05/13/2021: Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction

Complaint

05/13/2021: Complaint

Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

09/13/2021: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

10/12/2021: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/13/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal; Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Account Stated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Open Book Account; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $2956.35

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 08/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re Assignee/Small Claims Limit Fee Reduction; Comment: Declaration Re Reduced Filing Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less