This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/14/2022 at 11:17:07 (UTC).

Butte County Credit Bureau, a Corp vs Rivera, Jose Angel

Case Summary

On 05/18/2018 Butte County Credit Bureau, a Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Rivera, Jose Angel. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1636

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Butte County Credit Bureau, a Corp

Defendant

Rivera, Jose Angel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Selby, Joseph Luther

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Issued

03/22/2019: Writ of Execution Issued

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

04/03/2019: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/18/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Plaintiff's Default Judgment by Clerk

03/19/2019: Plaintiff's Default Judgment by Clerk

Plaintiff's Declaration of M. Anderson re: Interest

03/19/2019: Plaintiff's Declaration of M. Anderson re: Interest

Summons Issued / Filed

05/18/2018: Summons Issued / Filed

Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation

03/19/2019: Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation

Proof of Service of Summons Filed

07/17/2018: Proof of Service of Summons Filed

Complaint

05/18/2018: Complaint

Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

04/03/2019: Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

Writ of Execution Issued

03/22/2019: Writ of Execution Issued

Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation

03/19/2019: Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation

Plaintiff's Declaration of M. Anderson re: Interest

03/19/2019: Plaintiff's Declaration of M. Anderson re: Interest

Plaintiff's Default Judgment by Clerk

03/19/2019: Plaintiff's Default Judgment by Clerk

Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Jose Angel Rivera

03/19/2019: Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Jose Angel Rivera

Proof of Service of Summons Filed

07/17/2018: Proof of Service of Summons Filed

Summons Issued / Filed

05/18/2018: Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint

05/18/2018: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment; Party; Names; Butte County Credit Bureau, A Corp; Rivera, Jose Angel; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To; Butte County Credit Bureau, A Corp; Awarded Against; Rivera, Jose Angel; Judgment Amount: $14,344.21; Amount; Damages: $10,439.66; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 10.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,580.33; Attorney Fees: $1,914.22; Costs: $410.00; Total: $14344.21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Plaintiff's Declaration in Support of Attorney Fees Calculation; Comment: Declaration of Attorney Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Plaintiff's Declaration of M. Anderson re: Interest; Comment: Declaration of Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefault Judgment By Clerk; Plaintiff's Default Judgment by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Enter Default-Entered; Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default-Entered as to Jose Angel Rivera; Comment: Default Entered as to Jose Angel Rivera

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Second Cause of Action - Account Stated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: First Cause of Action - Open Book Account; Remedy: Attorney's Fees; Amount: $1914.22; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $10439.66; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $370.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 05/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 06/28/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Butte County Credit Bureau, A Corp is a litigant