This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 00:18:27 (UTC).

Bradford, Jana vs Howes, Michael

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Bradford, Jana filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Howes, Michael. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gingery, Virginia and McLean, Sandra L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1622

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

Judge Details

Judges

Gingery, Virginia

McLean, Sandra L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bradford, Jana

Respondent

Howes, Michael

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

McNally, Miriam Elizabeth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCRC 5.83 Status Conference; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: 2nd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketRFO/OSC Motion Hearing; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Respondent filed 5/9/2022 Request for Order regarding Bifurcation of Marriage and Retrieve Personal Belongings from Residence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketResponsive Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMinutes and Order - DCSS; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEvidence Hearing; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petitioner's Request for Order for Custody, Visitation, Child Support, Spousal Support, Property Control and Respondent's Girlfriend filed 11/24/2021; Petitioner: Bradford, Jana; Respondent: Howes, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: Petitioner's Certificate of Completion Six Hour Co-Parenting Course

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketProperty Declaration; Comment: Community, Quasi/ Commmunity and Separate Property Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Comment: Proof of Service of the Summons and Request for Order as to Respondent -Jurisdiction Date; 11/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 11/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Status Conference; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketRFO-OSC-MTN - (Custody or Visitation FC3170); Comment: Petitioner's Request for Order for Custody, Visitation, Child Support, Property Control and Respondent's Girlfriend

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDecl Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPetition for Disso, Legal Sep, Nullity, Dom Part

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer McNally, Miriam Elizabeth