This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 01:00:21 (UTC).

Bordenave, Neal vs Danyus, Braden J et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Bordenave, Neal filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Danyus, Braden J. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benson, Stephen E and Mosbarger, Tamara L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1692

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Judges

Benson, Stephen E

Mosbarger, Tamara L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bordenave, Neal

Defendants

Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois

Danyus, Braden J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Labar, Ivo Michael

Sawyer, Adrian James

Defendant Attorneys

Boos, Nicholas Justin

Porter, Corban James

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons as to Braden J Danyus

09/03/2020: Proof of Service of Summons as to Braden J Danyus

Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Answer to Complaint

09/28/2020: Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Answer to Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

08/26/2020: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois

08/28/2020: Proof of Service of Summons Filed as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois

Complaint

08/25/2020: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

08/25/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

06/16/2022: Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

Returned Mail

05/04/2022: Returned Mail

Proof of Mailing

04/25/2022: Proof of Mailing

Stipulation and Order Re Shortened Notice of Period for Defendants' Motion for Summary

04/07/2022: Stipulation and Order Re Shortened Notice of Period for Defendants' Motion for Summary

Returned Mail

09/21/2021: Returned Mail

Civil Minutes

08/18/2021: Civil Minutes

Returned Mail

08/13/2021: Returned Mail

Notice of Change of Address as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Attorney

08/09/2021: Notice of Change of Address as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Attorney

Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Case Management Statement

08/09/2021: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Case Management Statement

Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Response to Order to Show Cause; Declaration

08/09/2021: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois' Response to Order to Show Cause; Declaration

Proof of Service

08/09/2021: Proof of Service

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJury Trial; Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: 7 Day Estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Jury Trial - 7 Day Estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSettlement Conference; Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail; Comment: Proof of Mailing; Stipulation and Order re Shortened Notice Period

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Stipulation and Order Re Shortened Notice of Period for Defendants' Motion for Summary; Comment: Stipulation and Order Regarding Shortened Notice of Period for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or Adjudication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail; Comment: Proof of Mailing; Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinute Order; Civil Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Order to Show Cause; Proof of Mailing; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: Failure to Appear; Failure to File Case Management Statement; Plaintiff; Attorney: Labar, Ivo Michael; Defendant; Attorney: Boos, Nicholas Justin

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Intentional Tort; File Date 08/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Judicial Review; File Date 08/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Negligence; File Date 08/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 08/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 08/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Mosbarger, Tamara L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 09/01/2020; Served: 08/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOS NICHOLAS JUSTIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PORTER CORBAN JAMES