This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/07/2023 at 06:34:59 (UTC).

Bocast, Terra Amber vs. Bocast, Benjamin Kenneth

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 Bocast, Terra Amber filed an Other lawsuit against Bocast, Benjamin Kenneth. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1607

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bocast, Terra Amber

Respondent

Bocast, Benjamin Kenneth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketOrder Dismissing Action; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - Harassment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Temporary Order Denied; Continued from 08/08/2022; Petitioner: Bocast, Terra Amber; Respondent: Bocast, Benjamin Kenneth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - Harassment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Temporary Orders Denied; Petitioner: Bocast, Terra Amber; Respondent: Bocast, Benjamin Kenneth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 07/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Civil Harassment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less