This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/09/2022 at 03:22:26 (UTC).

Bechtel, Francis et al vs. California Department of Water Resources

Case Summary

On 08/10/2017 Bechtel, Francis filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against California Department of Water Resources. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2298

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Candela, Michael P

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bechtel, Francis

Ramirez, Chantel

Klein, Jacob

Johnson, Denise

Defendant

California Department of Water Resources

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

McNicholas, John Patrick, IV

Defendant Attorney

Phillips, James C

 

Court Documents

Receipt of Transfer from Superior Court of California County of Sacramento Case#34-2018-00228904-CLL

03/19/2018: Receipt of Transfer from Superior Court of California County of Sacramento Case#34-2018-00228904-CLL

Notice of Returned Documents re Transfer Fees

02/01/2018: Notice of Returned Documents re Transfer Fees

Plaintiff' s Order re: Stipulation to Transfer Venue to Sacramento County Pursuant to GC 955

01/29/2018: Plaintiff' s Order re: Stipulation to Transfer Venue to Sacramento County Pursuant to GC 955

Proof of Service of Summons Filed

09/11/2017: Proof of Service of Summons Filed

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conferenc

08/10/2017: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conferenc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/10/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

08/10/2017: Complaint

Notice Re JCCP 4974

01/11/2019: Notice Re JCCP 4974

Plainitff's Stipulatiion to Transfer Venue to Sacramento County Pursuant to GC 955

01/25/2018: Plainitff's Stipulatiion to Transfer Venue to Sacramento County Pursuant to GC 955

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Notice Re JCCP 4974; Comment: Notice Re JCCP 4974

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReceipt; Receipt of Transfer from Superior Court of California County of Sacramento Case#34-2018-00228904-CLL; Comment: of Transfer from Superior Court of California County of Sacramento Case#34-2018-00228904-CLL-NP-GDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketChange of Venue Granted; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Comment: Matter Transferred to Sacramento County Pursuant to Stipulation Filed 1/29/18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Plainitff's Stipulatiion to Transfer Venue to Sacramento County Pursuant to GC 955; Plaintiff' s Order re: Stipulation to Transfer Venue to Sacramento County Pursuant to GC 955; Notice of Returned Documents re Transfer Fees; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: Unable to transfer until we received the filing fees for Sacramento County - per Judge Mosbarger, if checks received, matter may be taken off calendar.; Plaintiff; Attorney: McNicholas, John Patrick, IV; Plaintiff; Attorney: McNicholas, John Patrick, IV; Plaintiff; Attorney: McNicholas, John Patrick, IV; Plaintiff; Attorney: McNicholas, John Patrick, IV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Returned Documents; Notice of Returned Documents re Transfer Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder; Plaintiff' s Order re: Stipulation to Transfer Venue to Sacramento County Pursuant to GC 955; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Comment: re: Stipulation to Transfer Venue to Sacramento County Pursuant to GC 955

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation; Plainitff's Stipulatiion to Transfer Venue to Sacramento County Pursuant to GC 955; Comment: to Transfer Venue to Sacramento County Pursuant to GC 955

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Paper - Unlimited Civil; Declaration of James C. Phillips Re: Inablility to Complete Meet and Confer Requirement; Comment: Declaration of James C. Philips Re: Inability to Complete Meet and Confer Requirement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketOther; Comment: Demand for Change of Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2017
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Real Property; Type: Action; Description: First - Permanent Private Nuisance; Remedy: Damages; Amount: $0.0; Remedy: Attorney's Fees; Amount: $0.0; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $0.0; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Real Property; File Date 08/10/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Real Property; File Date 08/10/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Real Property; File Date 08/10/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Real Property; File Date 08/10/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 08/25/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conferenc; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less