This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/26/2023 at 03:01:48 (UTC).

Ally Bank vs Kuhn, Angela L

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 Ally Bank filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kuhn, Angela L. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0546

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ally Bank

Defendant

Kuhn, Angela L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Aronson, Elizabeth Esther

McAllister, David Edward

Callahan, Drew Alexander

 

Court Documents

Complaint

03/06/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

03/06/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued and Filed

03/06/2023: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

03/06/2023: Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference

Declaration Re Diligence

03/29/2023: Declaration Re Diligence

Declaration Re Diligence

04/28/2023: Declaration Re Diligence

Declaration Re Diligence

04/28/2023: Declaration Re Diligence

Declaration Re Diligence

04/28/2023: Declaration Re Diligence

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference; Complaint; Declaration Re Diligence; Declaration Re Diligence; Declaration Re Diligence; Declaration Re Diligence; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re Diligence; Comment: Declaration Re Diligence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re Diligence; Comment: Declaration Re Diligence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re Diligence; Comment: Declaration Re Diligence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration; Declaration Re Diligence; Comment: Declaration Re Diligence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Breach of Contract; Remedy: Money- damages sought; Amount: $18031.11; Remedy: Court Costs; Amount: $370.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • Cause Of ActionCause Of Action: Contract; Type: Action; Description: Possesion of Personal Property

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 03/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Contract; File Date 03/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Service; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less