This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/24/2022 at 15:26:37 (UTC).

Allard, Amanda Hope vs. Jensen, Brandon Tyler

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Allard, Amanda Hope filed an Other lawsuit against Jensen, Brandon Tyler. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Gingery, Virginia and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2882

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Judges

Gingery, Virginia

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Allard, Amanda Hope

Respondent

Jensen, Brandon Tyler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - Harassment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Temporary Order Partly Granted; Petitioner: Allard, Amanda Hope

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketRequest for Order - Harassment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continuance of Hearing on Party's Motion; Comment: Temporary Restraining Order - Partly Granted; Petitioner: Allard, Amanda Hope

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketReq. to Continue - Civil Harassment With Temporary Orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Civil Harassment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Comment: Temporary Restraining Order - Partly Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less