This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/17/2022 at 18:08:34 (UTC).

Addams, Daylyn vs Addams, Paul

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 Addams, Daylyn filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Addams, Paul. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, North Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Keithley, Clare and McLean, Sandra L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1698

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Keithley, Clare

McLean, Sandra L

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Addams, Daylyn

Respondent

Addams, Paul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

McNally, Miriam Elizabeth

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCRC 5.83 Status Conference; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Comment: 2nd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Family Law Status Conference (CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order; Judicial Officer: Keithley, Clare; Comment: Stipulation Regarding Custody and Visitation, Payment of Uninsured Medical Expenses, Work-Related Daycare and Mortgage and

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketRFO/OSC Motion Hearing; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petitioner's Request for Order for Custody, Visitation, 1/2 of Child Care Expenses & 1/2 of Uncovered Medical Bills Filed 12/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketRFO/OSC Motion Hearing; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Petitioner's Request for Order for Custody, Visitation, 1/2 of Child Care Expenses & 1/2 of Uncovered Medical Bills Filed 12/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Continuance - No Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons Filed; Comment: Jurisdiction Date: 12/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Served: 12/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment and Status Conference; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketRFO-OSC-MTN - (Custody or Visitation FC3170); Comment: Request for Order for Custody, Visitation, 1/2 of Child Care Expenses & 1/2 of Uncovered Medical Bills

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDecl Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act (UCCJEA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPetition for Disso, Legal Sep, Nullity, Dom Part

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer McNally, Miriam Elizabeth