This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 08/28/2022 at 04:04:23 (UTC).

PEOPLE VS FORD, KIPP RAY

Case Summary

On 02/22/2007 PEOPLE filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FORD, KIPP RAY. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Benson, Stephen E and Lamb, William P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6443

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Benson, Stephen E

Lamb, William P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

FORD, KIPP RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Marquez, Roberto

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2016
  • DocketLegacy Docketable Information; Comment: Custody Status: PROB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • DocketLegacy Docketable Information; Comment: IGNITION INTERLOCK DEVICE REMOVAL NTC Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2010
  • DocketProgress Report; Comment: IGNITION INTERLOCK VERIFICATION REPORT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • DocketProgress Report; Comment: REPORT OF CALIBRATION VERIFICATION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • DocketCompletion of; Comment: CERT OF COMPLETION FILED PREVENTION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2009
  • DocketProgress Report; Comment: REPORT OF INTERLOCK CALIBRATION VERIFICATION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • DocketLegacy Docketable Information; Comment: IGNITION INTERLOCK VERIFICATION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • DocketCompletion of; Comment: CERT OF COMPLETION FILED -MULTIPLE OFF PGM *18mos *agency fee still due Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: RCW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2009
  • DocketCollections - Referred to Butte County Central Collections; Comment: CASE REFERRED TO CENTRAL COLLECTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • DocketLegacy Docketable Information; Comment: IGNITION INTERLOCK INSTALLATION VERIFICATION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLS

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2007
  • DocketBail Bond Filed; Comment: BAIL BOND: BANKERS INS/MCMAINS BB 555018877-5 $52000.00 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: LSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2007
  • DocketLegacy Fee Information; Comment: Exception Info from Charges File: Code Section: VR Disp Description: OTHER - STAYED PENDING Fine 1 - $943.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2007
  • DocketLegacy Fee Information; Comment: Exception Info from Charges File: Code Section: SUPERVISION FEE Description: PROBATION SUPERVISION FEES Disp Description: OTHER - STAYED PENDING Fine 1 - $3636.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2007
  • DocketLegacy Fee Information; Comment: Exception Info from Charges File: Code Section: PRESENTENCE RPT Description: PRESENTENCE REPORT Disp Description: OTHER - STAYED PENDING Fine 1 - $481.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2007
  • DocketLegacy Fee Information; Comment: Exception Info from Charges File: Code Section: ASF Description: ADMINSTRATION SCREENING FEE Disp Description: OTHER - STAYED PENDING Fine 1 - $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2007
  • DocketLegacy Fee Information; Comment: Exception Info from Charges File: Code Section: 1214.1 Description: CIVIL ASSESSMENT Fine 1 - $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2007
  • DocketLegacy VOP Charge Information; Comment: Exception Info from Charges File: Code Section: 1203.2(a) CCR: PC Description: VIOLATION OF PROB - PTN FILED Count: 0 Felony/MisDemeanor: A Type of Sentence: 430 Sentence Desc 1: FORMAL HIDE PROB MODIFIED AND Sentence Desc 2: SERVE 30 DAYS FOR VIOLATION OF Sentence Date: 2008-10-30 00:00:00.0000000 Disposition: 632 Disposition Date: 2008-10-30 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Description: ADMITTED VOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2007
  • DocketLegacy Fee Information; Comment: Exception Info from Charges File: Code Section: 1202.4 Description: RESTITUTION FINE Disp Description: OTHER - STAYED PENDING Fine 1 - $200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • ChargeCharges: FORD, KIPP RAY; 2; Description: VC23152(b)-F- Driving W/.08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/1900
  • ChargeCharges: FORD, KIPP RAY; 1; Description: VC23152(a)-F- Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol/Drugs; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marquez, Roberto