This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 22:04:41 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. ZARATE, GAVIN ANSELMO

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ZARATE, GAVIN ANSELMO. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Caraway, Corie J, Merrifield, Kimberly, Mosbarger, Tamara L, Deems, Michael R, Candela, Michael P, Heithecker, Philip H, Bigelow, Molly, Worley, Kurt W, Rodriguez, Jesus A, Lucena, Kristen A, Benson, Stephen E, Keithley, Clare, Gingery, Virginia and McLean, Sandra L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0356

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Caraway, Corie J

Merrifield, Kimberly

Mosbarger, Tamara L

Deems, Michael R

Candela, Michael P

Heithecker, Philip H

Bigelow, Molly

Worley, Kurt W

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Lucena, Kristen A

Benson, Stephen E

Keithley, Clare

Gingery, Virginia

McLean, Sandra L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

ZARATE, GAVIN ANSELMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Defendant Attorney

Plesser, Steven Brian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Bigelow, Molly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Bigelow, Molly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Court Call Authorized for S. Plesser and Attorney General's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Bigelow, Molly; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Court Call Authorized for S. Plesser and Attorney General's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketJudge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1; Judicial Officer: McLean, Sandra L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:32 PM; Result: Held; Comment: CCP170.1 KWW; Court Call authorized for attorney general and defense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketJudge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketJudge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketJudge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CourtCall Authorized for AG and Defense Attorney; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; Attorney General: Office of the Attorney General; Defendant; Retained Counsel: Plesser, Steven Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy Attorney General B. Bowers: BCSO 21-6421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketBail Bond Filed; Comment: Right Now Bail Bonds U100-21233540

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2021
  • ChargeCharges: ZARATE, GAVIN ANSELMO; 003; Description: PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Statute: 273a(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2021
  • ChargeCharges: ZARATE, GAVIN ANSELMO; 002; Description: PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Statute: 273a(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2021
  • ChargeCharges: ZARATE, GAVIN ANSELMO; 001; Description: PC273.5(a)-M- Corporal Injury To Spouse/Cohabitant; Statute: 273.5(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant