This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 10/06/2022 at 01:14:35 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Zabala, David Matthewivan

Case Summary

On 08/04/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Zabala, David Matthewivan. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3739

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Zabala, David Matthewivan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Williams, Benjamin A.

Sorenson, Janae

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: B. Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Please address amended 136.2 order, need protected persons description; Need Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J Greeson; CPD 22-03417

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Zabala, David Mathew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Zabala, David Matthewivan; 001; Description: PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sorenson, Janae