This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/07/2022 at 21:01:55 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. YOUNG, AMANDA LYN

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against YOUNG, AMANDA LYN. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4348

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

YOUNG, AMANDA LYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Court Probation; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 09/15/2022; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 09/15/2022; Term Type: Jail; Term: 24 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; HS11350(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver; 003; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; No Contest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketProbation Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney D. Jin-Lee; PK 220904N-0268

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: YOUNG, AMANDA LYN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2022
  • ChargeCharges: YOUNG, AMANDA LYN; 003; Description: HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2022
  • ChargeCharges: YOUNG, AMANDA LYN; 002; Description: HS11350(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11350(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2022
  • ChargeCharges: YOUNG, AMANDA LYN; 001; Description: PC148.9(a)-M- Giving False Identification To Peace Officer; Statute: 148.9(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.