This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 22:05:24 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Yocum, Marcus Daniel

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Yocum, Marcus Daniel. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Linda, Rodriguez, Jesus A, Worley, Kurt W, Deems, Michael R, Lucena, Kristen A and Giordano, Raymond J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1318

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Linda

Giordano, Raymond J

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Worley, Kurt W

Lucena, Kristen A

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Yocum, Marcus Daniel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Diamond, Nicole M.

Femino, Stephana

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketProbation Report; Comment: Original

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Giordano, Raymond J; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketProhibited Persons Relinquishment Form Findings; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketProbation Officer's Prohibited Persons Relinquishment Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Guilty; 002; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Guilty; 003; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketReferred to Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney C. Greeson CPD 22-01355 22-01419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Yocum, Marcus Daniel; 003; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Yocum, Marcus Daniel; 002; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Yocum, Marcus Daniel; 001; Description: PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Femino, Stephana

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.