This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/15/2022 at 21:09:03 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Wood, Jesse Lee

Case Summary

On 08/11/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Wood, Jesse Lee. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3852

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Wood, Jesse Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketBail Hearing; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion; Comment: Need Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 010; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 009; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 008; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/04/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 007; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 006; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 005; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 004; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 003; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 002; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 001; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.