This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/10/2022 at 22:02:19 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Wood, Jesse Lee

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Wood, Jesse Lee. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Candela, Michael P, Gingery, Virginia and Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1734

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Candela, Michael P

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Wood, Jesse Lee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Williams, Benjamin A.

Caraway, Christopher W.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Receipt of Prop 63 Advisement and Forms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Cited to Appear for Count 2 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion; Comment: Special Set by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: DA to be present

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney L Butzow BCSO 22-02203; With Copy of Citation 22-1309; 22-00794

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: *Vacate 06/03/22; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Wood, Jesse Lee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 001; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 002; Description: HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Jesse Lee; 003; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caraway, Christopher W.