This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/15/2022 at 22:01:37 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Wood, Isaac Peter

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Wood, Isaac Peter. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1327

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Wood, Isaac Peter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketWarrant Returned and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketWarrant Recalled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMotion hearings - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Defense Motion to Recall Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration; Comment: Declaration in Support of Motion to Recall Bench Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketMotion to Recall Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued to BCSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketRelease on Own Recognizance Revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFailure to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Warrant Ordered; Comment: appearance of counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Wood, Isaac Peter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney L. Butzow BC 21-0081

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Wood, Isaac Peter; 001; Description: VC23103(a)-M- Reckless Driving On Highway; Statute: 23103(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant