This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/16/2022 at 23:09:00 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Williams, Michael Levi Lewis

Case Summary

On 07/19/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Williams, Michael Levi Lewis. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3478

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Williams, Michael Levi Lewis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketPretrial Conference; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC602(k)-M- Trespass With Intent To Interfere; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Need stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketChange of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Williams, Michael Levi Lewis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney L Butzow; BCSO 22-02881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Williams, Michael Levi Lewis; 001; Description: PC602(k)-M- Trespass With Intent To Interfere; Statute: 602(k); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.