This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 12/01/2022 at 23:13:39 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Wilkinsblum, Gavin David

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Wilkinsblum, Gavin David. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodriguez, Jesus A, Worley, Kurt W and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4622

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Rodriguez, Jesus A

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Wilkinsblum, Gavin David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketProof of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketOrder on Fee Waiver - Denied; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DispositionTerminal Sentence; 001; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Terminal Sentence; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 10/06/2022; Term Type: Jail; Term: 30 Days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; 001; PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; No Contest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J Mannion; CPD 22-5847

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wilkinsblum, Gavin David; 001; Description: PC273.6(a)-M- Disobeying Domestic Relations Court Order; Statute: 273.6(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J