This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/23/2022 at 03:38:34 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. White, Arin Jessica

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against White, Arin Jessica. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Caraway, Corie J, Worley, Kurt W and Rodriguez, Jesus A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4764

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Caraway, Corie J

Worley, Kurt W

Rodriguez, Jesus A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

White, Arin Jessica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Receipt of Prop 63 Advisement and Forms

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion; Comment: Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Warrant Ordered; Comment: Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketAmended Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney E. Romo CPD 22-06035

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus A; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: White, Arin Jessica

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • ChargeCharges: White, Arin Jessica; 001; Description: PC243(e)(1)-M- Battery Against Cohabitant/Spouse; Statute: 243(e)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.