This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 20:05:13 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Wells, Jesse James

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Wells, Jesse James. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H and Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2359

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Heithecker, Philip H

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Wells, Jesse James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Ortner, Eric R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketProhibited Persons Relinquishment Form Findings; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProbation Officer's Prohibited Persons Relinquishment Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketProbation Report; Comment: Probation Officer's Report (Original)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Enhancement Stricken - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC21310-F- Carrying Dirk/Dagger; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Sentencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketReferred to Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar; Comment: Need Statement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Comment: First Amended Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney S. Roose; CPD 22-02878

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Wells, Jesse James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wells, Jesse James; 001; Description: PC667(d)-1170.12(b) - Prior Serious Felony Conviction; Statute: 667(d)-1170.12(b); Level: Enhancement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wells, Jesse James; 001; Description: PC21310-F- Carrying Dirk/Dagger; Statute: 21310; Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ortner, Eric R