This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/13/2022 at 00:00:22 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Wells, Jesse James

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Wells, Jesse James. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Heithecker, Philip H, Worley, Kurt W and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1847

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Merrifield, Kimberly

Worley, Kurt W

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Wells, Jesse James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Caraway, Christopher W.

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DispositionTerminal Sentence; 001; PC484(a)-M- Theft; Terminal Sentence; Comment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; PC484(a)-M- Theft; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; 001; PC484(a)-M- Theft; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Relieved; Comment: C Caraway

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney T. Vercruyssen; GBPD 22-260

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Wells, Jesse James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wells, Jesse James; 001; Description: PC484(a)-M- Theft; Statute: 484(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caraway, Christopher W.