This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 01/31/2023 at 21:01:35 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Watson, Joseph Allen

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Watson, Joseph Allen. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Benson, Stephen E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5779

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Benson, Stephen E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Watson, Joseph Allen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketChange of Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Defendant to retain counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Benson, Stephen E; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Cited for 12/29 @ 8:30 AM; Defendant: Watson, Joseph Allen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Teja, CHPO M398-240-22 With Citation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Watson, Joseph Allen; 005; Description: VC4462(b)-I- Registration Or Plate Displayed/Presented For Wrong Vehicle; Statute: 4462(b); Level: Infraction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Watson, Joseph Allen; 004; Description: VC16028(a)-I- Failure To Provide Financial Responsibility Evidence To Officer; Statute: 16028(a); Level: Infraction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Watson, Joseph Allen; 003; Description: VC14601.1(a)-M- Driving With Suspended/Revoked License; Statute: 14601.1(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Watson, Joseph Allen; 002; Description: HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Watson, Joseph Allen; 001; Description: HS11377(a)-M- Possession Of Controlled Substance; Statute: 11377(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.