This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/13/2021 at 21:01:35 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs Watson, Bruce Edward

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Watson, Bruce Edward. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3606

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Watson, Bruce Edward

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DispositionParole/Post Release Community Supervision; 001; PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Parole/Post Release Community Supervision; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 07/16/2021; Consecutive: any other matter; Term Type: Jail; Term: 90 Days; Comment: Report to probation 1st business day following release

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 001; PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Admitted Violation (PCS/Parole/Mandatory Supervision)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Deems, Michael R; 001; PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPost Release Community Supervision Reinstated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPost Release Community Supervision Revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketArraignment Violation - Post Release Community Supervision; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 07/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPetition - Revoke Post Release Community Supervision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • ChargeWatson, Bruce Edward; PC3455 - Revocation Of Post-Release Community Supervision; Statute: 3455; Level: Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant