This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/07/2021 at 22:01:12 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs WARD, LEON BEDFORD

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WARD, LEON BEDFORD. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Worley, Kurt W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2966

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Worley, Kurt W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

WARD, LEON BEDFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • DispositionParole/Post Release Community Supervision; 001; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Parole/Post Release Community Supervision; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 07/02/2021; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Term Type: Jail; Term: 135 Days; Comment: without time loss; Comment; Comment; (Defendant ordered to report to Parole 1st business day following release. Court finds no ability to pay fines/fees.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer; Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Admitted Violation (PCS/Parole/Mandatory Supervision)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer; Worley, Kurt W; 001; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Admit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketParole Reinstated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketParole Revoked

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketFound in Violation of Parole

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketArraignment Parole Violation; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 6/9/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed; Comment: J Petelin appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Commissioner - Judge Pro Tem; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketArraignment Parole Violation; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition Filed 6/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketPetition - Revoke State Parole

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • ChargeWARD, LEON BEDFORD; PC3000.08-F- Parole Violation; Statute: 3000.08; Level: Unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J