This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/22/2022 at 21:00:24 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Wang, Shiling Amy

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Wang, Shiling Amy. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W and Gingery, Virginia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3586

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Gingery, Virginia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Wang, Shiling Amy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Diamond, Nicole M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Worley, Kurt W; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Comment: Need Stipulation and Statement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Gingery, Virginia; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney S. Edwards CPD 22-02634

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Filed; Comment: McMains Bail Bonds U100-21357582

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wang, Shiling Amy; 002; Description: VC23153(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol Causing Injury; Statute: 23153(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wang, Shiling Amy; 001; Description: VC23153(a)-M- Driving Under Influence Of Alcohol Causing Injury; Statute: 23153(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.