This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 04/01/2022 at 00:38:50 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Walborn, Kyle James

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Walborn, Kyle James. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Caraway, Corie J and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5724

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Caraway, Corie J

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Walborn, Kyle James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Fahey, Michael W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Enrollment - DUI School; Comment: Solutions for Positive Choices

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DispositionCourt Probation; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Court Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 01/07/2022; Start Time: 5:00 PM; Term Type: Jail; Term: 2 Days; Comment: 48 Hours ordered, programs authorized; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 12/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 002; VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; 001; VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; No Contest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketPayment Plan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketReferral to DUI Program

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Caraway, Corie J; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Need Stip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketFinancial Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Defendant: Walborn, Kyle James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney L. Butzow; CHPO M455-240-21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketAgreement for Release on Own Recognizance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Walborn, Kyle James; 002; Description: VC23152(b)-M- Driving With .08% Or Greater Blood Alcohol; Statute: 23152(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • ChargeCharges: Walborn, Kyle James; 001; Description: VC23152(a)-M- Driving Under The Influence Of Alcohol; Statute: 23152(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fahey, Michael W