This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 20:05:31 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Wadman, Levi Garrett

Case Summary

On 05/13/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Wadman, Levi Garrett. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Worley, Kurt W, Candela, Michael P, Lucena, Kristen A and Heithecker, Philip H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2362

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Worley, Kurt W

Candela, Michael P

Lucena, Kristen A

Heithecker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Wadman, Levi Garrett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Ortner, Eric R

Petelin, James J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Petition filed 6/24/2022; Probation Revoked 6/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketArraignment on Violation of Probation; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: petition filed 6/24/22; probation review set 7/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketPetition - Violation of Probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketProbation Review; Judicial Officer: Candela, Michael P; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continuance on Party's motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DispositionFormal Probation; 001; PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Formal Probation; Adult Confinement; Type: Jail; Start Date: 05/19/2022; Concurrent: any other; Term Type: Jail; Term: 60 Days; Probation; Status; Status: Active; Date: 05/19/2022; Status; Status: Revoked; Date: 06/30/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo; 004; PC594(a)-M- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Sentenced-Plea of Guilty/Nolo

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketCriminal Protective Order - PC136.2; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney J. Bennett; BCSO 22-01709

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Wadman, Levi Garrett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wadman, Levi Garrett; 004; Description: PC594(a)-M- Vandalism: Defacing/Damaging/Destroying Property; Statute: 594(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wadman, Levi Garrett; 003; Description: PC417(a)(1)-M- Exhibiting Deadly Weapon; Statute: 417(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wadman, Levi Garrett; 002; Description: PC236-M- False Imprisonment; Statute: 236; Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Wadman, Levi Garrett; 001; Description: PC273a(b)-M- Child Abuse/Endangerment; Statute: 273a(b); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petelin, James J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ortner, Eric R