This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 09/20/2022 at 21:01:54 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Vanhorn, Joseph Henry

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Vanhorn, Joseph Henry. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Worley, Kurt W and Deems, Michael R. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3544

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Worley, Kurt W

Deems, Michael R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Vanhorn, Joseph Henry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Williams, Benjamin A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketAdult Disposition of Arrest and Court Action - JUS8715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J Mannion; CPD 22-04464

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Deems, Michael R; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Vanhorn, Joseph Henry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Vanhorn, Joseph Henry; 001; Description: PC148(a)(1)-M- Resist, Obstruct/Delay Peace Officer; Statute: 148(a)(1); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williams, Benjamin A.