This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 21:04:27 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. Vang, Yee Leng

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against Vang, Yee Leng. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Giordano, Raymond J, Lucena, Kristen A and Merrifield, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1998

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Giordano, Raymond J

Lucena, Kristen A

Merrifield, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

Vang, Yee Leng

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorneys

Diamond, Nicole M

Diamond, Nicole M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Giordano, Raymond J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: time est 30 min

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketTime Waiver - General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Giordano, Raymond J; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Not Guilty; 004; HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Not Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketFurther Arraignment/Entry of Plea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketBail Bond Filed; Comment: Aladdin Bail Bonds SV25-5212737

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketPublic Defender Appointed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed by Deputy District Attorney J. Miller, BCSO 22-02485

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Merrifield, Kimberly; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: Vang, Yee Leng

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Detention and Bail Setting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Vang, Yee Leng; 004; Description: HS11364(a)-M- Unlawful Possession Of Smoking Device/Drug Paraphernalia; Statute: 11364(a); Level: Misdemeanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • ChargeCharges: Vang, Yee Leng; 001; Description: PC29800(a)(1)-F- Possession Of Firearm By Felon; Statute: 29800(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diamond, Nicole M.