This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 11/24/2022 at 05:45:22 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. TrujilloAlvizar, Javier

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TrujilloAlvizar, Javier. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lucena, Kristen A, Heithecker, Philip H and Caraway, Corie J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3200

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lucena, Kristen A

Heithecker, Philip H

Caraway, Corie J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

TrujilloAlvizar, Javier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Marquez, Roberto

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 2 hour time est

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order - Jail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Setting; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Hearing Setting; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketMotion hearings - Predisposition; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Defense motion for defendant to be released on O/R or reasonable bail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketOR Workup

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Heithecker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held; Plaintiff: People of the State of California; District Attorney: Butte County District Attorney; Defendant: TrujilloAlvizar, Javier

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSubpoenaed Records

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketSubpoenaed Records

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketWarrant Issued; Comment: Warrant Issued to BCSO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketSubpoenaed Records

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketOrder on Declaration in Support of Arrest Warrant; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Probable Cause for Arrest Warrant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint Filed By Deputy District Attorney J. Miller; CHPO F081-240-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • ChargeCharges: TrujilloAlvizar, Javier; 001; Description: VC23558- Causing Injury/Death To Multiple Victims - Additional Term; Statute: 23558; Level: Enhancement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • ChargeCharges: TrujilloAlvizar, Javier; 001; Description: PC191.5(a)-F- Gross Vehicular Manslaughter While Intoxicated; Statute: 191.5(a); Level: Felony

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marquez, Roberto