This case was last updated from Butte County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 04:10:59 (UTC).

People of the State of California vs. TINDILL, DAKOTA EUGENE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 People of the State of California filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TINDILL, DAKOTA EUGENE. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts, Butte County Superior Court - Butte County Courthouse located in Butte, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucena, Kristen A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6000

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Butte, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lucena, Kristen A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

People of the State of California

Defendant

TINDILL, DAKOTA EUGENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Butte County District Attorney

Defendant Attorney

Rooney, Michael Martin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketSentencing Hearing; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketProbation Officer's Prohibited Persons Relinquishment Report; Comment: Probation Officer's Firearms Relinquishment Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketProbation Report; Comment: Probation Officer's Report (Original)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DispositionDisposition; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 001; PC245(a)(1)-F- Assault With Deadly Weapon; Dismissal - Harvey Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DispositionPlea; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; 002; PC245(a)(4)-F- Assault Likely To Produce Great Bodily Injury; Guilty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketRight to Confront and Cross Examine Witnesses Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPrivilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketRight to Trial by Jury Waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketPlea Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketFingerprint Form

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 60 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketTime Waived for Preliminary Hearing - 10 Day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketStatement of Rights

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketConditions of Release on Bail or OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketArraignment; Judicial Officer: Lucena, Kristen A; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNotice To Appear; Comment: Arraignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Comment: Complaint filed by Deputy District Attorney D. Garner; PPD 21-0698

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: TINDILL, DAKOTA EUGENE; 002; Description: PC245(a)(4)-F- Assault Likely To Produce Great Bodily Injury; Statute: 245(a)(4); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • ChargeCharges: TINDILL, DAKOTA EUGENE; 001; Description: PC245(a)(1)-F- Assault With Deadly Weapon; Statute: 245(a)(1); Level: Felony

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People of the State of California is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rooney, Michael Martin